Global Patent Index - EP 0871669 A4

EP 0871669 A4 2000-02-09 - HUMAN SOMATOSTATIN-LIKE RECEPTOR

Title (en)

HUMAN SOMATOSTATIN-LIKE RECEPTOR

Title (de)

MENSCHLICHER SOMATOSTATIN-ÄHNLICHER REZEPTOR

Title (fr)

RECEPTEUR HUMAIN SOMATOSTATINOIDE

Publication

EP 0871669 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95943863 A

Priority

  • US 9516472 W
  • US 35767594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9618651A1] This invention relates to a novel human somatostatin-like receptor, isolated nucleic acids encoding same, recombinant host cell transformed with a somatostatin-like receptor encoding DNA and to uses of the expressed receptor and nucleic acid sequences in drug screening and development as well as in therapeutic and diagnostic applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A01K 67/027; A61K 39/395; C07K 14/72; C07K 16/28; C12N 1/21; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/85; G01N 33/50; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 38/04 (2006.01); A61P 3/00 (2006.01); A61P 5/00 (2006.01); A61P 5/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/72 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/723 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9313130 A1 19930708 - ARCH DEV CORP [US]
  • [A] WO 9405695 A1 19940317 - UNIV NEW YORK [US]
  • [PX] DATABASE EMEST25 E.M.B.L. Databases; 15 February 1995 (1995-02-15), AUFFRAY C ET AL: "H. sapiens partial cDNA sequence; clone c-1zf10", XP002123628
  • [T] LAKAYE ET AL: "Cloning of the rat brain cDNA encoding for the SLC-1 G protein-coupled receptor reveals the presence of an intron in the gene", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, vol. 1401, no. 2, 4 February 1998 (1998-02-04), pages 216 - 220, XP000856696
  • See also references of WO 9618651A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9618651 A1 19960620; AU 4522796 A 19960703; EP 0871669 A1 19981021; EP 0871669 A4 20000209; JP H10511936 A 19981117; ZA 9510686 B 19960703

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1016196

2001-12-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-02-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991222

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/12 A, 7C 12N 15/11 B, 7C 12N 15/85 B, 7C 12N 5/10 B, 7C 12N 1/21 B, 7C 07K 14/72 B, 7C 07K 16/28 B, 7A 61K 39/395 B, 7G 01N 33/50 B, 7G 01N 33/53 B, 7A 01K 67/027 B

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970715

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL