Global Patent Index - EP 0871698 B1

EP 0871698 B1 2000-04-12 - METHOD OF PRODUCING BREAKAGE-RESISTANT DETERGENT TABLETS

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING BREAKAGE-RESISTANT DETERGENT TABLETS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BRUCHSTABILEN REINIGUNGSTABLETTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE DETERGENTS SOUS FORME DE COMPRIMES RESISTANT A LA RUPTURE

Publication

EP 0871698 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96901299 A

Priority

  • DE 19502774 A
  • EP 9600200 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19502774A1] The invention concerns a method of producing breakage-resistant detergent tablets by mixing individual constituents comprising pentaalkali triphosphate with a phase I portion of at least 20 wt %, alkali silicates, which can optionally contain water of crystallization, optionally alkali carbonates, bleaches, bleach activators, foam-inhibitors and/or enzymes, antidust compounds and/or nonionic surfactants, and by compacting at pressures of more than 7 MPa.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/06; C11D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 17/0091 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19502774 A1 19960801; AT 191745 T 20000415; EP 0871698 A1 19981021; EP 0871698 B1 20000412; ES 2146382 T3 20000801; FI 973114 A0 19970725; FI 973114 A 19970725; PT 871698 E 20001031; WO 9623053 A1 19960801

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050118

2003-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031122

2002-10-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-08-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020119

2002-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020119

2002-01-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020118

2002-01-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020118

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010314

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010131

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010125

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010116

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010116

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010108

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010105

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20001227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-08-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146382 T3

2000-06-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604972 20000518

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR IT NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191745 T 20000415

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990618

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970721

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR IT NL PT SE