Global patent index - EP 0871947 B1

EP 0871947 B1 2000-01-19 - SYSTEMS FOR INFORMATION-CARRYING SIGNS

Title (en)

SYSTEMS FOR INFORMATION-CARRYING SIGNS

Title (de)

INFORMATIONS-SCHILD-SYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES POUR PANNEAUX VECTEURS D'INFORMATIONS

Publication

EP 0871947 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95935613 A

Priority

  • NL 9500357 W
  • NL 9401728 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9612266A1] The system is composed of signs, means for securing the system to the immobile world and coupling means. Signs according to the invention consist of a front shield and a back shield which can be rapidly fastened to each other by means of a locking system operated by a special key. The signs can be rapidly interconnected according to a fixed pattern by means of a standard coupling piece. All connections are invisible and inaccessible for unauthorized persons. The front shield comprises an integrated reflector and does not use costly retroreflecting foils. Important advantages of the invention are its resistance against vandalism, low purchasing and managerial costs, rapidity and flexibility in use and, finally, a nice and quiet appearance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 7/00; G09F 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/00 (2006.01); G09F 7/18 (2006.01); G09F 13/16 (2006.01); G09F 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/00 (2013.01); G09F 7/18 (2013.01); G09F 13/16 (2013.01); G09F 2007/1804 (2013.01); G09F 2013/0472 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9612266 A1 19960425; DE 69514695 D1 20000224; EP 0871947 A1 19981021; EP 0871947 B1 20000119; NL 9401728 A 19960603

INPADOC legal status

2001-06-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2000-06-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69514695

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

2000-01-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990210

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970516

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL SE