Global Patent Index - EP 0871953 A4

EP 0871953 A4 2000-02-09 - TWO-DIMENSIONAL ARRAY OF MODULATABLE LIGHT SOURCES

Title (en)

TWO-DIMENSIONAL ARRAY OF MODULATABLE LIGHT SOURCES

Title (de)

ZWEIDIMENSIONALE MATRIX MODULIERBARER LICHTQUELLEN

Title (fr)

GROUPEMENT BIDIMENSIONNEL DE SOURCES LUMINEUSES MODULABLES

Publication

EP 0871953 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95939837 A

Priority

US 9514533 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9715921A1] An apparatus for generating a two-dimensional array of modulated light beams. A laser and a collimator (101) are used to generate a single collimated light beam (111). This collimated light beam is passed through a two-dimensional holographic beam splitter (102). Thereupon, the holograpic beam splitter produces a two-dimensional divergent array of diffraction limited collimated light beams. These light beams are then independently modulated by a two-dimensional modulator array (104).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/00; G02B 5/32; G11B 7/125

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/32 (2006.01); G02B 27/10 (2006.01); G02F 1/01 (2006.01); G02F 1/055 (2006.01); G11B 7/128 (2012.01); G11B 7/1353 (2012.01); G11B 7/14 (2006.01); G11B 7/003 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/128 (2013.01); G02B 5/32 (2013.01); G02B 27/108 (2013.01); G02B 27/1086 (2013.01); G02F 1/0551 (2013.01); G11B 7/1353 (2013.01); G11B 7/14 (2013.01); G11B 7/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] WO 9505944 A1 19950302 - MICRACOR INC [US]
  • [Y] EP 0491458 A1 19920624 - GEN ELECTRIC [US]
  • [A] US 5113286 A 19920512 - MORRISON RICK L [US]
  • [A] US 3744910 A 19730710 - VAN DEELEN W
  • [A] FELDMAN M R ET AL: "ITERATIVE ENCODING OF HIGH-EFFICIENCY HOLOGRAMS FOR GENERATION OF SPOT ARRAYS", OPTICS LETTERS,US,OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, vol. 14, no. 10, pages 479-481, XP000003450, ISSN: 0146-9592
  • [A] WATABE A ET AL: "Multi-beam read-verifying optical head for parallel recording", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 1 (REGULAR PAPERS & SHORT NOTES), NOV. 1993, JAPAN, vol. 32, no. 11B, pages 5406 - 5410, XP002124626, ISSN: 0021-4922
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 387 (P - 1576) 20 July 1993 (1993-07-20) & US 5619488 A 19970408 - OTA TAKESHI [JP], et al
  • See also references of WO 9715921A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9715921 A1 19970501; AU 4150696 A 19970515; EP 0871953 A1 19981021; EP 0871953 A4 20000209; JP H11513817 A 19991124

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040311

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-02-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 11B 7/00 A, 7G 02B 5/32 B, 7G 11B 7/125 B

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980515

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB