Global Patent Index - EP 0871992 B1

EP 0871992 B1 2000-07-26 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE VERBINDERANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0871992 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96907015 A

Priority

  • JP 2731995 A
  • JP 1395195 A
  • JP 13876795 A
  • JP 29604995 A
  • US 9601134 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/08; H01R 12/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/08 (2006.01); H01R 12/24 (2006.01); H01R 12/38 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

CN 1069451 C 20010808; CN 1169210 A 19971231; DE 69609526 D1 20000831; DE 69609526 T2 20010419; EP 0871992 A1 19981021; EP 0871992 B1 20000726

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-01-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-22 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020104

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609526 20000831

2000-08-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2000-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-03-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/08 A, 7H 01R 12/24 B

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990805

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970723

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT