Global Patent Index - EP 0872195 A3

EP 0872195 A3 2000-10-25 - Utensil for cleaning teeth and freshening breath

Title (en)

Utensil for cleaning teeth and freshening breath

Title (de)

Zahnreinigungs- und Atemerfrischungsgerät.

Title (fr)

Ustensile pour le nettoyage des dents et le rafraîchissement de l'haleine

Publication

EP 0872195 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830227 A

Priority

IT SA970012 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872195A2] Utensil for cleaning teeth, disposable, with a handle which may be either of a set length or be extensible through a rotating extension, and which contains a dose of toothpaste. The handle shows, at one end; a slot, shaped in such a way as to allow it to be inserted in a rectangular cubic body (3), slightly longer than the slot (2) itself and which is made up of two superimposed layers of spongy material: almost a half of the lower layer (6), not used for cleaning the teeth, is inserted halfway into the slot (2) and is made up of very soft spongy material; the upper layer (5), which does come into contact with the teeth, is made up of a more rigid sponge which remains completely outside the slot (2). A space is made in the interface (4) where a dose of toothpaste is injected. All that has been previously described can be sold ready assembled in single packs or, eventually, with one or two spare spongy heads which can be changed once, twice, or three times a day (morning, after lunch, evening). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/04 (2006.01); A46B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/005 (2013.01); A46B 11/0003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872195 A2 19981021; EP 0872195 A3 20001025; IT SA970012 A1 19970715

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 46B 9/04 A

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI