Global Patent Index - EP 0872196 A3

EP 0872196 A3 2000-02-23 - Seat with book tray

Title (en)

Seat with book tray

Title (de)

Kollegtablar

Title (fr)

Tablette de siège

Publication

EP 0872196 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105259 A

Priority

DE 19715637 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6012773A] Stackable row chairs can be provided with desk assemblies for lecture hall purposes by forming a holder for the desk assembly with a pair of struts upon stirrups at their lower ends engaging the legs of the chair provided with the assembly. Connecting members can run from the stirrups to an adjoining chair to allow the desk assembly simultaneously to serve as a connecting system for joining the chairs in the row.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/70; A47C 1/124; A47C 7/58; A47C 7/68; A47C 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/124 (2013.01); A47C 7/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872196 A2 19981021; EP 0872196 A3 20000223; DE 19715637 A1 19981022; US 6012773 A 20000111

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020817

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020405

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB NL

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000118

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 7/70 A, 7A 47C 7/68 B, 7A 47C 1/124 B, 7A 47C 7/58 B, 7A 47C 13/00 B

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI