Global Patent Index - EP 0872219 B1

EP 0872219 B1 2002-09-18 - USE OF THE BIO-FREQUENCY SPECTRUM IN ANIMAL EMBRYO-ENGINEERING

Title (en)

USE OF THE BIO-FREQUENCY SPECTRUM IN ANIMAL EMBRYO-ENGINEERING

Title (de)

ANWENDUNG DES BIOFREQUENZSPEKTRUMS IN DER EMBRYOTECHNOLOGIE BEI TIEREN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DU SPECTRE DE FREQUENCES BIOLOGIQUES DANS LES TECHNIQUES EMBRYOLOGIQUES ANIMALES

Publication

EP 0872219 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95936416 A

Priority

  • CN 9500087 W
  • CN 94118306 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872219A1] The invention discloses the use of bio-frequency spectrum in embryogenesis and development of animal embryo, and the use of bio-frequency spectrum in promoting propagation and development of animals. The mature rate of oocyte, the fertility of fertilized egg, and the quality of embryo can be improved by exposure oocyte, egg cell, sperm and embryo to the minic bio-frequency spectrum irradiation in the course of production of embryo in vitro.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61D 19/00; C12N 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61D 19/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872219 A1 19981021; EP 0872219 A4 19990203; EP 0872219 B1 20020918; AU 3838695 A 19960617; AU 704690 B2 19990429; CA 2207013 A1 19960530; CA 2207013 C 20060711; CN 1068195 C 20010711; CN 1123131 A 19960529; DE 69528295 D1 20021024; DE 69528295 T2 20030508; WO 9615732 A1 19960530

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151101

2015-11-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20151101

2015-11-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69528295

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141110

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69528295 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010316

1999-02-03 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19981223

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970623

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB