Global Patent Index - EP 0872271 A3

EP 0872271 A3 2001-01-03 - Capsule holder for rotational mixing device

Title (en)

Capsule holder for rotational mixing device

Title (de)

Kapselhalter für Rotations-Mischgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support de capsule pour appareil de mixage par rotation

Publication

EP 0872271 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106899 A

Priority

DE 29707012 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2234011A1] A capsule holder for retaining a mixing capsule on a rotary mixing device includes a carrier plate 10, an actuator disk 11 rotatable relative to the plate, and two retaining arms 12, 13 for clamping the capsule from opposite sides, the retaining arms having driving pins 22 engaging spiral cam slots 26 of the actuator disk 11. By rotating the actuator disk 11, the retaining arms 12, 13 are moved away from, or toward, each other. The thus constituted gearing is self-locking in one direction of force transmission so that centrifugal forces exerted on the retaining arms 12, 13 during rotation cannot move the arms apart. On the other hand, the retaining arms 12, 13 are opened with little effort by rotating the actuator disk 11.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 9/00; A61C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61C 5/06 (2006.01); B01F 9/22 (2006.01); B01F 11/00 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 11/0008 (2013.01); B01F 15/00746 (2013.01); Y10S 366/602 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29707012 U1 19980813; AU 6077198 A 19981022; AU 732898 B2 20010503; CA 2234011 A1 19981018; CA 2234011 C 20040217; EP 0872271 A2 19981021; EP 0872271 A3 20010103; EP 0872271 B1 20030129; JP H119981 A 19990119; US 6010240 A 20000104; US 6152593 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59807037

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150414

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150408

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: 3M DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59807037

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-02-29 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: 3M DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFUS

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090415

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090415

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807037

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LISSNER, WERNER

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHAEFER, OLAF

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-07-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LISSNER, WERNER

2002-07-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHAEFER, OLAF

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: 3M ESPE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE GB LI

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI