Global Patent Index - EP 0872286 A3

EP 0872286 A3 2000-01-19 - Process and device for the mechanical cleaning of beverage packings for recurrent usage

Title (en)

Process and device for the mechanical cleaning of beverage packings for recurrent usage

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die mechanische Reinigung von Getränkeverpackungen zur periodischen Verwendung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le nettoyage mécanique des emballages de boissons pour l'usage périodique

Publication

EP 0872286 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98201131 A

Priority

DE 19716311 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872286A2] A process and a device for the mechanical cleaning of beverage packings for recurrent usage made of glass or plastic is described, which consists of one or more washing cycles or zones and rinsing cycles or zones in a cleaning installation. The beverage packings for recurrent usage are subjected to a pre-treatment, before being conveyed to the actual cleaning installation. The beverage packings for recurrent usage are being sprayed via one or more spray nozzles (9, 10, 11) with an air-cleaning composition mixture in the form of a spraying mist, which enters through the opening into the inside of the beverage packings for recurrent usage to be cleaned, where the spraying mist is spreading out evenly. The pre-treatment makes certain that also tenacious contamination or a micro-organism like fungus or yeast is effectively removed in the cleaning installation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872286 A2 19981021; EP 0872286 A3 20000119; CA 2234739 A1 19981018

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020302

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991214

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI