Global Patent Index - EP 0872365 B1

EP 0872365 B1 2001-01-24 - Lower arm for three-point coupling

Title (en)

Lower arm for three-point coupling

Title (de)

Unterlenker für Dreipunkt-Kupplung

Title (fr)

Barre inférieure pour attelage à trois points

Publication

EP 0872365 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98106431 A

Priority

IT BO970226 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872365A1] A lower arm for a three-point coupling of the type used, for example, on agricultural tractors for the connection of agricultural implements and the like, comprises a coupling device (7) for an implement and a bar (2) connected rigidly to the coupling device. The upper wall of the bar has a ridge or projection (14) in the vicinity of the connection (11) with the engagement device (7). In one particular embodiment at least one recess or dent (12) is formed in the vicinity of the connection (11) with the engagement device (7), the ridge or projection (14) being defined by the portion of the recess or dent (12) facing the connection region. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60D 1/14; B60D 1/155

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01B 59/00 (2006.01); B60D 1/14 (2006.01); B60D 1/155 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01B 59/004 (2013.01); B60D 1/141 (2013.01); B60D 1/155 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872365 A1 19981021; EP 0872365 B1 20010124; AT 198857 T 20010215; DE 69800496 D1 20010301; DE 69800496 T2 20010809; IT 1292864 B1 19990211; IT BO970226 A1 19981015; IT BO970226 D0 19970415

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110407

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110407

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2012-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 198857 T

- Effective date: 20110407

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110407

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800496

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100420

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100415

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800496 20010301

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198857 T 20010215

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000711

1999-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990414

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI