Global Patent Index - EP 0872413 A3

EP 0872413 A3 2000-04-12 - Floating working volume

Title (en)

Floating working volume

Title (de)

Schwebender Nutzraum

Title (fr)

Volume flottant utile

Publication

EP 0872413 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810136 A

Priority

CH 63297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872413A2] The balloon (101) is of prolate spheroid shape, like a rugby ball, with its longitudinal axis vertical. The room (102) open to the public is situated at the bottom end of the vertical shape and consists of a small balloon compartment of variable volume, filled with air and kept at above atmospheric pressure. It may have reclining sets (122). The air-filled room acts as a compensating ballonet if the balloon gains height and the external air pressure drops. The ballonet is separated from the main helium-filled balloon by a flexible partition (121) which may bulge upwards or downwards to compensate for expansion or contraction of the helium gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B64B 1/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/22 (2006.01); G09F 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/22 (2013.01); G09F 21/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872413 A2 19981021; EP 0872413 A3 20000412; EP 0872413 B1 20020828; AT 222870 T 20020915; DE 59805282 D1 20021002; US 6116538 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050219

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050219

2005-02-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050219

2004-03-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040302

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040225

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805282 20021002

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222870 T 20020915

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011203

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI