Global Patent Index - EP 0872422 B1

EP 0872422 B1 2001-05-16 - Device for making bags

Title (en)

Device for making bags

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Beutelpackungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication de sacs

Publication

EP 0872422 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98100488 A

Priority

DE 19715766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872422A1] Each bag is made from a vertically supplied packing tube and closed by bag closing device (15). Several U-section gripper-like sockets (21) are mounted evenly spread out on a circle on a rotor (27) which rotates about a horizontal axis set across the alignment of the bag forming device (11) and bag closing device (15). The sockets are aligned by gears with their longitudinal axis constantly upright so that they are pushed by their open side over the end part of the tube (2) and seize this as it is separated from the tube as the bag. The bag is then held in the socket by a controlled vacuum and entrained. When the vacuum is switched off the bag (1) falls between the entrainment members (16) of the conveyor chain which are aligned under the socket and move at the same speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 43/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/465 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872422 A1 19981021; EP 0872422 B1 20010516; DE 19715766 A1 19981022; ES 2157611 T3 20010816

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59800709

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080114

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070504

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2006-01-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060124

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-09-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-01-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030114

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020124

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011224

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157611 T3

2001-08-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800709 20010621

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2000-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000330

1999-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES GB IT LI

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990421

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI