Global Patent Index - EP 0872446 A3

EP 0872446 A3 2000-05-03 - Hydraulic installation for a forklift truck

Title (en)

Hydraulic installation for a forklift truck

Title (de)

Hydraulik-Installation an einem Gabelstapler-Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Installation hydraulique pour chariot élévateur à fourche

Publication

EP 0872446 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107020 A

Priority

DE 19716442 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872446A2] The system includes a hydraulic lift drive formed as simple hydraulic cylinder (11), for a hydraulic ramp movable along a mast, and a hydraulic tilt drive for the mast. A lift control valve (14) has a first position corresponding to a lifting function, a second intermediate position maintained by a spring, corresponding to the standstill of the drive cylinder butt (13), and a third position corresponding to a lowering function. The released cross-section of a flow path is controllable in the first and third position. The control valve is formed as a 5/3-way valve (14), whose main butt is moved by a digital controllable electric servo-motor (96). A pressure sensor (107) produces electric output signals corresponding to the pressure in the drive chamber (12) of the lift drive cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 11/05 (2006.01); F15B 13/01 (2006.01); F15B 13/044 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2013.01); F15B 11/05 (2013.01); F15B 13/015 (2013.01); F15B 13/044 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30525 (2013.01); F15B 2211/327 (2013.01); F15B 2211/351 (2013.01); F15B 2211/353 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6313 (2013.01); F15B 2211/665 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6654 (2013.01); F15B 2211/761 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872446 A2 19981021; EP 0872446 A3 20000503; EP 0872446 B1 20031022; DE 19716442 A1 19981022

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59809944

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070417

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060316

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070417

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070417

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809944 P 20031127

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARTMANN & LAEMMLE GMBH & CO. KG

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARTMANN + LAEMMLE GMBH & CO. KG

2002-05-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHULZE, ECKEHART

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000408

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI