Global patent index - EP 0872563 B1

EP 0872563 B1 2000-05-24 - Method and device for heat treating

Title (en)

Method and device for heat treating

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Wärmebehandeln

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de traitement thermique

Publication

EP 0872563 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400761 A

Priority

FR 9705230 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872563A1] A device is claimed for heat treatment incorporating a cooling system (1, 2, 3, 4, 4') comprising a distribution system (3, 4, 4') delivering at least one cooling fluid. It also incorporates a protection system (5, 5a, 5b, 12, 12') arranged in such a manner that it is able to maintain a protective gaseous atmosphere over at least a part of the distribution system (3, 4, 4'). The method for using this device for heat treatment of a material is also claimed, in which (a) at least one jet containing at least one hot gas vector is sprayed onto at least a part of the surface of the material; (b) at least a part of the material is cooled by means of at least one distribution nozzle delivering a fluid refrigerant; and (c) at least a part of the distribution nozzle is maintained under a protective gaseous atmosphere containing at least one protective gas. A protective sleeve for the device, the utilisation of the device in a heat treatment process and components fabricated by such a process are also claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 1/667; B05B 1/00; C21D 1/613; C23C 4/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/74 (2006.01); C21D 1/613 (2006.01); C21D 1/667 (2006.01); C23C 4/12 (2006.01); F25D 3/10 (2006.01); F27D 7/06 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/10 (2013.01); C21D 1/613 (2013.01); C21D 1/667 (2013.01); C23C 4/12 (2013.01); B21B 45/0233 (2013.01); B21B 2045/0212 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872563 A1 19981021; EP 0872563 B1 20000524; CA 2235423 A1 19981028; DE 69800158 D1 20000629; DE 69800158 T2 20001123; ES 2147039 T3 20000816; FR 2762667 A1 19981030; FR 2762667 B1 19990528; GR 3033691 T3 20001031; JP H1144489 A 19990216; US 5989647 A 19991123

INPADOC legal status

2008-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020225

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-05-27 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2003-04-16 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20020927

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. L'*AIR LIQUIDE POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-07-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2002-04-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020308

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020225

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020218

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020214

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020211

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-04-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-03-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010309

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010228

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-08-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147039

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800158

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-06-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI NL SE

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990614

1999-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI NL SE

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990421

1998-11-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: REMY, FRANCIS

1998-11-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HANSZ, BERNARD

1998-11-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GOURLAOUEN, VINCENT

1998-11-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CODDET, CHRISTIAN

1998-11-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PESME, FRANCOIS

1998-11-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LIAO, HAN LIN

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GR IT LI NL SE

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI