Global Patent Index - EP 0872582 B1

EP 0872582 B1 2001-12-05 - Handling device for a can exchanging carriage of a spinning machine

Title (en)

Handling device for a can exchanging carriage of a spinning machine

Title (de)

Handhabegerät auf einem Kannenwechselwagen einer Spinnmaschine

Title (fr)

Appareil manipulateur pour un charriot changeur de pots d'un métier à filer

Publication

EP 0872582 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98105817 A

Priority

  • DE 19713905 A
  • DE 19721640 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5934059A] A manipulating device for can changing between a can changing carriage and a row of payout cans in a spinning machine is described for the case where rectangular cans are used. To automate the transfer of the cans without substantially increasing the expense for space in the region of the carriage compared with the case of manual transfer, and without having to engage an empty can, which is to be pulled out of a row of cans, from behind or beneath the can, a substantially one-piece can carrier is provided, which is supported displaceably, crosswise to the carriage travel direction, in a rail guide on the carriage and which on each of its longitudinal ends has a preferably pivotably supported gripper, each for coupling to one short side of the cans.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 9/00; B65H 67/04; D01H 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/06 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/0428 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 5934059 A 19990810; EP 0872582 A1 19981021; EP 0872582 B1 20011205; JP H10279189 A 19981020

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2003-03-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030320

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR IT LI

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LANGEN, MANFRED

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LANGEN, MANFRED

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010220

1999-08-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH FR IT LI

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990410

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH FR IT LI

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI