Global Patent Index - EP 0872611 A3

EP 0872611 A3 2001-02-28 - Awning, especially an awning with articulated arms

Title (en)

Awning, especially an awning with articulated arms

Title (de)

Markise, insbesondere Gelenkarmmarkise

Title (fr)

Store, notamment store à bras articulés

Publication

EP 0872611 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106000 A

Priority

DE 19716302 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872611A2] In the front area of the blind sheet (13), viewed in the outward movement direction, an elastic cover windable with the sheet is provided. With the blind moved inwards and the sheet (13) wound up, the cover (15) covers at least the upper side of the sheet winder (16). The cover in the form of a sheet or a coating is applied to the upper side of the blind sheet. The cover is applied to the front edge of the blind sheet. It extends between the front edge of the blind sheet and a lowering tube (12) of the blind. It can also be formed as blind slat-type lamellas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/04 (2006.01); E04F 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872611 A2 19981021; EP 0872611 A3 20010228; DE 19716302 A1 19981022; JP H10317625 A 19981202

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-01-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI