Global Patent Index - EP 0872613 B1

EP 0872613 B1 2002-12-04 - Lock with rotating retainer

Title (en)

Lock with rotating retainer

Title (de)

Verschluss mit rotierbarem Mitnehmer

Title (fr)

Serrure à entraîneur rotatif

Publication

EP 0872613 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400912 A

Priority

FR 9704600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872613A1] A lock with a bolt (1) or slider operated by a rotary drive member (2) actuated by a key and rotary security element (4), such as a barrel or cylinder, has the drive member located with an angular clearance in a lengthwise slot (5) in a freely-rotating ring (6). The bolt or slider has a rectangular lengthwise cut-out (8) forming two end shoulders (9,10) with a central tooth (13). The drive member is located eccentrically relative to the ring and its pivot axis (3) is offset further from the slider than the axis of rotation of the ring. The length of the tooth is such that the trajectory of the free end of the drive member does not intersect the parallel to the slider's direction of travel at a tangent to the tooth's free end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/04 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/0017 (2013.01); E05B 17/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872613 A1 19981021; EP 0872613 B1 20021204; AT 229120 T 20021215; DE 69809832 D1 20030116; FR 2762035 A1 19981016; FR 2762035 B1 19990521

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170502

2018-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171229

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-04-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: DOM-METALUX, FR

- Effective date: 20140305

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *METALUX

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-03-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809832 20030116

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL

2002-12-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229120 T 20021215

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001221

1999-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981119

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI