Global Patent Index - EP 0872631 B1

EP 0872631 B1 2002-11-13 - Camshaft-angular position identifier disk arrangement for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Camshaft-angular position identifier disk arrangement for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Anordnung einer Nockenwellen-Geberscheibe zur Nockenwellenlageerkennung an einer Nockenwelle einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Ensemble arbre à cames - disque indicateur de position angulaire pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0872631 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98105315 A

Priority

DE 19715856 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872631A1] The unit (1), e.g. camshaft indicator disc (2) and camshaft (3) for an internal combustion engine with four cylinders and has four segments (8-11). Two short segments (8,9) follow two long segments (10,11). Connected to the long segments are short intermediate spaces (14,15) and connected to the short segments are long intermediate spaces (12,13). The flanks at the beginning and at the end of the first short segment (8), and the flanks at the beginning and possible at the end of the first long segment (10) are vertical to the central plane (16) of the shaft. The intermediate space (14) between the two long segments is fully cost, at least in parts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/46; F01L 1/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/047 (2006.01); F01L 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/46 (2013.01); F01L 1/047 (2013.01); F01L 2820/041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872631 A1 19981021; EP 0872631 B1 20021113; DE 19715856 A1 19981029; DE 19715856 B4 20050127

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806232

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110324

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100318

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-02-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806232 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020305

1999-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990421

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI