Global Patent Index - EP 0872645 A3

EP 0872645 A3 2000-04-05 - Electrohydraulic device for driving and remotely controlling a hydraulic distributor

Title (en)

Electrohydraulic device for driving and remotely controlling a hydraulic distributor

Title (de)

Elektrohydraulische Antriebseinrichtung zur Fernsteuerung eines hydraulischen Verteilers

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement électro-hydraulique pour commander à distance un distributeur hydraulique

Publication

EP 0872645 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98104126 A

Priority

IT MI970862 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872645A2] An electrohydraulic device for driving and remotely controlling a hydraulic distributor of a directional valve for pressurizing or connecting to the discharge a pair of user devices comprising: two proportional electric valves (1, 2), which are fed by a pressure line (P), have a discharge line (T), and are connected respectively to opposite end chambers (M, N) of a hydraulic distributor (6) adapted to pressurize or connect to the discharge (T) two user devices; remote control means adapted to generate an electric control signal to energize electromagnets (11, 12) of the electric valves (1, 2); and an electronic circuit (5a, 5b) adapted to control and adjust the energization current of the electromagnets as a function of the electric control signal; the energization current drives the electromagnets (11, 12) for the selective feeding of the chambers with a preset pressure or for their connection to the discharge across the electric valves in order to move the slider (3) of the distributor (6) proportionally to the energization current; the electronic circuit is integrated in the body that houses the hydraulic distributor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/043

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 13/043 (2006.01); F15B 13/044 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0402 (2013.01); F15B 13/0433 (2013.01); F15B 13/0442 (2013.01); F15B 2013/0409 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872645 A2 19981021; EP 0872645 A3 20000405; EP 0872645 B1 20031112; DE 69819587 D1 20031218; DE 69819587 T2 20040916; DK 0872645 T3 20040216; IT 1291564 B1 19990111; IT MI970862 A1 19981014

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-12-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150310

2015-10-26 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69819587

2014-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-03-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69819587 P 20031218

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK SE

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011122

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK SE

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI