Global Patent Index - EP 0872646 B1

EP 0872646 B1 2003-06-18 - Pneumatic actuator

Title (en)

Pneumatic actuator

Title (de)

Druckluftzylinder

Title (fr)

Vérin pneumatique

Publication

EP 0872646 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98107107 A

Priority

DE 19716564 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872646A1] The pneumatic cylinder has a piston connecting rod which is connected with an operating mechanism, preferably a shaft of an exhaust valve of a engine brake via a valve lever. An outer channel (228) is provided for feeding compressed air in and out, and is connected via a channel (229) with the cylinder housing. A holding device is provided for the piston in the inwardly moved position. A drawback device is provided for piston from the outwardly moved to the inwardly moved position and comprises a pressure chamber (240). A feed channel (230) and an outlet channel are provided, together with an inlet valve and an outlet valve, both of which are connected with the outer channel (228). The pressure chamber via the feed channel (230) and the inlet valve is simultaneously with the cylinder housing fillable with compressed air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/26; F15B 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/14 (2006.01); F15B 15/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/06 (2013.01); F15B 15/1452 (2013.01); F15B 15/1476 (2013.01); F15B 15/149 (2013.01); F15B 15/261 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872646 A1 19981021; EP 0872646 B1 20030618; DE 19716564 A1 19981022

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180417

2018-05-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-05-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180417

2018-04-18 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20180417

2018-04-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59808731

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170411

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-09-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808731 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

1999-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990406

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI