Global Patent Index - EP 0872648 A3

EP 0872648 A3 2000-02-23 - Lengthwise adjustable pole, especially adapted for a ski pole or a walking stick

Title (en)

Lengthwise adjustable pole, especially adapted for a ski pole or a walking stick

Title (de)

Längenverstellbares Rohr, insbesondere für Ski- oder Wanderstöcke

Title (fr)

Tube réglable en longueur, en particulier pour bâton de ski ou canne de marche

Publication

EP 0872648 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105693 A

Priority

DE 29706849 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872648A2] The device consists of an inner and an outer tube (11,12), and an expander unit (15) on the inner tube, to clamp it axially. The expander unit has a radially expandable element (16) with internal cone, and an internal element (17), which has a complementary outer cone and slides axially in the expander element. The device also has an axially directed adjusting screw (18). The screw is non-turnably held on the inner tube, it meshes with an internally threaded bore (21) in the internal element, and its end engages behind the internal element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16B 7/14; A45B 9/00; A63C 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 9/00 (2006.01); A63C 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/221 (2013.01); A45B 9/00 (2013.01); A45B 2009/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29706849 U1 19980813; EP 0872648 A2 19981021; EP 0872648 A3 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041112

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI