Global Patent Index - EP 0872689 B1

EP 0872689 B1 2002-11-27 - Process for conveying and metering dry brown coal dust to the combustion chamber of steam boilers

Title (en)

Process for conveying and metering dry brown coal dust to the combustion chamber of steam boilers

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Förderung und Dosierung von Trockenbraunkohlestaub (TBK-Staub) in den Feuerraum von Dampferzeugern (DE)

Title (fr)

Procédé de transport et de dosage du lignite pulvérisé sèche dans le foyer des générateurs de vapeur

Publication

EP 0872689 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98106210 A

Priority

DE 19715973 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872689A2] The pneumatic conveyor consists of a continuous conveyor and dispenser with at least one lock (2) for the pulverised lignite controlled by the capacity. The pressure of the pulverised lignite (TBK) is equalised to the pressure-level of the feeder (3) container by tensioning (19) and tension-release (18) gas conveyors, with controls and meters for the maximum and minimum levels. The feeder container (3) has a swirl-base, a mechanical homogeniser in the fluidised bed, a weighing device (10) and regulator, and pressure-meter and regulator in relation to the nominal value of the flow of pulverised lignite.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23K 1/00; F23D 1/00; F23K 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23K 1/04 (2006.01); F23D 1/00 (2006.01); F23K 1/00 (2006.01); F23K 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23K 3/02 (2013.01); F23D 1/00 (2013.01); F23K 1/00 (2013.01); F23D 2900/01001 (2013.01); F23K 2201/101 (2013.01); F23K 2201/20 (2013.01); F23K 2203/103 (2013.01); F23K 2900/03001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR IE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872689 A2 19981021; EP 0872689 A3 19990922; EP 0872689 B1 20021127; CZ 9801073 A3 19990317; DE 19715973 A1 19981022; PL 325817 A1 19981026

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0872689E

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806391 20030109

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IE IT

2002-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BBP POWER PLANTS GMBH

2002-05-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRETSCHMER, HORST, DR.-ING.

2002-05-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DEGENKOLB, DIETMAR, DIPL.-ING.

2002-05-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRITZ, PETER, DR.-ING.

2002-05-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHINGNITZ, MANFRED, DR.-ING.

2002-04-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR CONVEYING AND METERING DRY BROWN COAL DUST TO THE COMBUSTION CHAMBER OF STEAM BOILERS

2002-03-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR CONVEYING AND METERING DRY BROWN COAL DUST TO THE COMBUSTION CHAMBER OF STEAM BOILERS

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011017

2000-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GR IE IT

1999-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991008

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IE IT

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI