Global Patent Index - EP 0872693 A3

EP 0872693 A3 2001-12-12 - Air Conditioner having refrigerant leakage alarming function based on the senses of human

Title (en)

Air Conditioner having refrigerant leakage alarming function based on the senses of human

Title (de)

Klimaanlage mit Kühlmittelleckanzeige anhand menschlicher Sinneswahrnehmung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de climatisation avec détection de fuite de réfrigerant par perception humaine

Publication

EP 0872693 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98106979 A

Priority

  • JP 11517797 A
  • JP 11517897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872693A2] According to an air conditioner (1) of the present invention, a smell element is added to refrigerant used in a refrigerant circuit, and dye is added to at least one of the refrigerant and refrigerant machine oil (lubricant). The smell element provides irritant smell to the refrigerant, and the dye provides bright color such as red or yellow to the refrigerant and/or the refrigeration machine oil. When the refrigerant leaks from an element of the refrigerant circuit, the irritant smell or the color of the refrigerant (refrigeration machine oil) enables inhabitants to easily recognize the refrigerant leakage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/00 (2006.01); F25B 49/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/30 (2018.01); F24F 11/36 (2018.01); F24F 11/52 (2018.01); F24F 2003/1689 (2013.01); F25B 49/005 (2013.01); F25B 2500/222 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] EP 0768198 A2 19970416 - NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]
  • [A] GB 1587907 A 19810415 - HERCULES INC
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 04 30 April 1997 (1997-04-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 175 (C - 179) 3 March 1983 (1983-03-03)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872693 A2 19981021; EP 0872693 A3 20011212; EP 0872693 B1 20050406; DE 69829603 D1 20050512; DE 69829603 T2 20060622

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090416

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090416

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090416

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080416

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829603 P 20050512

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020124

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI