Global Patent Index - EP 0872695 A3

EP 0872695 A3 2000-05-10 - Heating boiler with temperature control

Title (en)

Heating boiler with temperature control

Title (de)

Heizkessel mit Temperatursteuerung

Title (fr)

Chaudière avec contrôle de température

Publication

EP 0872695 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105699 A

Priority

DE 29707099 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872695A2] The control (4) operates the burner (2) by a turn-on command when a bottom threshold value for the temperature of the medium is undershot. The burner is switched off when the top threshold value is exceeded. A time-lag device (7) between the control and burner delays the control's switch-on command to the burner by a pre-set amount of time which is adjustable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/08 (2006.01); F24H 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/082 (2013.01); F24H 9/2035 (2013.01); F23N 2023/20 (2013.01); F23N 2025/19 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29707099 U1 19970605; EP 0872695 A2 19981021; EP 0872695 A3 20000510

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030121

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI