Global patent index - EP 0872702 A3

EP 0872702 A3 2000-01-26 - Pyrotechnic charge located within a tube

Title (en)

Pyrotechnic charge located within a tube

Title (de)

Pyrotechnische Ladung in einem Rohr

Title (fr)

Charge pyrotechnique disposée dans un tube

Publication

EP 0872702 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106895 A

Priority

DE 19716511 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872702A2] Practice hand grenade or fire brigade device comprises a pyrotechnic charge in a tube. The tube has a closure which opens under gas pressure. The closure (30) has at least two sections, and an outer silicone layer (21) near the tube opening (33), joins a lightweight closure (18) to the tube (3). The closure pref. consists of a foamed material, e.g. styrene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 8/26; F42B 4/00; F42B 12/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 4/00 (2006.01); F42B 8/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 8/26 (2013.01); F42B 4/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872702 A2 19981021; EP 0872702 A3 20000126; EP 0872702 B1 20031001; AT 251301 T 20031015; DE 19716511 A1 19981022; DK 0872702 T3 20040202; NO 317408 B1 20041025; NO 981703 A 19981020; NO 981703 D0 19980416

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-12-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-05-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051230

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050416

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-11-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-06-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-04-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050417

2005-04-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050416

2005-04-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050416

2005-04-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050416

2005-04-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050416

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040428

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-04-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040402

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-04-01 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040401

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-04-01 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040401

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040309

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-02-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-02-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030405319

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-01-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO. KG

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59809762

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20031106

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO. KG

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI FR GB GR IT NL SE

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE DK FI FR GB GR IT NL SE

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7F 42B 8/26 A, 7F 42B 12/36 B, 7F 42B 4/00 B

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI FR GB GR IT NL SE

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI