Global Patent Index - EP 0872812 A3

EP 0872812 A3 2000-06-21 - Device for printing strip-like printing supports

Title (en)

Device for printing strip-like printing supports

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Bedrucken streifenförmiger Druckträger

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour imprimer des supports d'impression en forme de bande

Publication

EP 0872812 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250055 A

Priority

DE 19712077 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19712077C1] The printing and franking machine is used with letters or cards 4 that are moved from a magazine 3 by a feed belt 1 through the ink jet printing stage. The items are held against a guide plate 2 by a series of contact units 11. The guide plate is set a distance a that is greater than the defined maximum thickness of the letter and is set at an angle to the vertical.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/12 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); B41J 11/005 (2013.01); B41J 13/12 (2013.01); G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00483 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00532 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19712077 C1 19980402; EP 0872812 A2 19981021; EP 0872812 A3 20000621; US 6109713 A 20000829

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050829

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI