Global Patent Index - EP 0872825 A3

EP 0872825 A3 2000-10-25 - A method for improving the resonance of a musical instrument, and a musical instrument made by the method

Title (en)

A method for improving the resonance of a musical instrument, and a musical instrument made by the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Resonanzverbesserung eines Musikinstrument und Musikinstrument gemacht mit diesem Verfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé pour améliorer la résonance d'un instrument de musique instrument de musique fabriquer avec ce procédé

Publication

EP 0872825 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98302985 A

Priority

JP 11614597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872825A2] There is provided a method of improving a resonance of a sounding board (12) of a musical instrument (10) by coating a surface of the sound board with a lubricant (14) wherein after application, said lubricant (14) is dried on said surface (12) to form a temporary or permanent resonance layer (14) on said sounding board surface (12). Also provided is a musical instrument comprising a temporary or permanent resonance layer (14) formed from a lubricant on an inner and/or outer surface of the sounding board (12) of said instrument (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10D 7/00; G10D 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/28 (2006.01); G10D 1/00 (2006.01); G10D 7/00 (2006.01); G10D 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10D 7/005 (2013.01); G10D 1/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872825 A2 19981021; EP 0872825 A3 20001025; JP H10293573 A 19981104

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-08-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI