Global Patent Index - EP 0872923 B1

EP 0872923 B1 2001-12-19 - Device for electrically connecting several electrical female contact elements

Title (en)

Device for electrically connecting several electrical female contact elements

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur elektrischen Verbindung von mehreren elektrischen Buchsenkontakten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour relier électriquement plusiers organes femelles de contact électrique

Publication

EP 0872923 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98400855 A

Priority

FR 9704623 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0872923A1] The device is made of a conducting material and has an H shape with four branches (1-4) connected through a core (5). Each pair of branches (1-2,3-4) are folded close to the core along parallel directions so that the device presents the shape of a Z. Each branch extremity can be engaged by a female electrical connector (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 31/00; H01R 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/04 (2006.01); H01R 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/00 (2013.01); H01R 13/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0872923 A1 19981021; EP 0872923 B1 20011219; DE 69802992 D1 20020131; DE 69802992 T2 20020620; ES 2168726 T3 20020616; FR 2762146 A1 19981016; FR 2762146 B1 19990514

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050409

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050409

2005-04-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-04-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-04-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040406

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168726 T3

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802992 20020131

2002-01-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011220

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990527

1999-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

1999-01-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981127

1998-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1998-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI