Global Patent Index - EP 0873059 B1

EP 0873059 B1 2000-05-24 - DEVICE FOR THE ADJUSTMENT OF THE INCLINATION OF THE UPPER PART OF A SPORTS SHOE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR THE ADJUSTMENT OF THE INCLINATION OF THE UPPER PART OF A SPORTS SHOE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER SEITENNEIGUNG EINES SCHUH-OBERTEILES EINES SPORTSCHUHES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE DE L'INCLINAISON LATERALE DE LA PARTIE SUPERIEURE D'UNE CHAUSSURE DE SPORT

Publication

EP 0873059 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96942169 A

Priority

  • AT 9600247 W
  • AT 1496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9724939A1] The invention concerns a device for the adjustment of the inclination of the upper part (2) of a sports shoe (1), which is connected to the shoe lower part (3) by means of a link pin (4) and which is swivable in the longitudinal direction of the shoe, with a control element (8) fixed to one of the shoe parts (2, 3) for the height adjustment of a long side of the shoe upper part (2) to different height positions relative to the lower part (3), and with a clamping device (5, 6) with whose help the shoe upper part (2) can be fixed to the shoe lower part (3) in the adjusted height position; for the precise and regular adjustment of the inclination, the control element (8) has a longitudinal slot (7) with control surfaces (12, 13) facing the link pin (4), which run at an angle to the direction of movement of the control element (8) for height adjustment of the shoe upper part (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0466 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9724939 A1 19970717; AT 193188 T 20000615; AT 403238 B 19971229; AT A1496 A 19970515; DE 59605327 D1 20000629; EP 0873059 A1 19981028; EP 0873059 B1 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081213

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABP PATENTMARKETING GMBH

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: KARAGHIOSOFF GIORGIO

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605327 20000629

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193188 T 20000615

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991005

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980423

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI