Global patent index - EP 0873075 B1

EP 0873075 B1 2000-02-02 - SUCTION DEVICE FOR CLEANING

Title (en)

SUCTION DEVICE FOR CLEANING

Title (de)

SAUGGERÄT FÜR REINIGUNGSZWECKE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ASPIRATION A DES FINS DE NETTOYAGE

Publication

EP 0873075 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95941639 A

Priority

EP 9504728 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9719630A1] The invention relates to a suction device for cleaning having a collecting container which has a closeable suction inlet (11), a suction outlet and a valve (30) therebetween and is connected to a suction unit by way of a suction line from the suction outlet (12). The suction line can be closed by an outlet valve (30) and a external air supply closeable by a supply valve is arranged on that side of the filter (13) which faces away from suction inlet (11). The invention proposes to develop said suction device in such a manner that it allows simple, implementable filter dedusting in that it comprises a valve link unit which links closing of the inlet valve associated with the suction inlet and/or opening of the supply valve with closing of the outlet valve (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9719630 A1 19970605; DE 59507757 D1 20000309; DK 0873075 T3 20000501; EP 0873075 A1 19981028; EP 0873075 B1 20000202

INPADOC legal status

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-11-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59507757

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-08-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-06-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131115

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507757

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK IT LI SE

2000-01-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990421

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980523

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK IT LI SE