Global Patent Index - EP 0873177 B1

EP 0873177 B1 2000-01-19 - A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR ODORIZATION

Title (en)

A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR ODORIZATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERTEILEN VON DUFTSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION D'AGENTS ODORANTS

Publication

EP 0873177 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96941252 A

Priority

  • SE 9504244 A
  • SE 9601514 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9719746A1] An apparatus comprises a conduit member extending from a first source (5) of a carrier gas and from a second source of an odorant (4) to a conduit system (1) for a gas. The conduit member is configured in such a manner that the odorant is added to the carrier gas which subsequently is supplied to the conduit system (1). Furthermore, the apparatus comprises a buffer container (10) for storing the mixture of odorant and carrier gas, and means arranged to vaporize the odorant so that it will be in a gaseous state in the buffer container (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 3/02; C10J 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 3/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9719746 A1 19970605; AR 004763 A1 19990310; AT 188885 T 20000215; AU 1044697 A 19970619; BR 9611770 A 19990223; CZ 9801645 A3 19991117; DE 69606327 D1 20000224; DE 69606327 T2 20000824; EE 03810 B1 20020815; EE 9800166 A 19981215; EP 0873177 A1 19981028; EP 0873177 B1 20000119; ES 2142102 T3 20000401; HU 221045 B1 20020729; HU 9900133 A2 19990428; HU 9900133 A3 20000328; NO 982362 A 19980706; NO 982362 D0 19980525; PL 183839 B1 20020731; PL 326942 A1 19981109; SE 505635 C2 19970922; SE 9504244 D0 19951128; SE 9504244 L 19970529; SK 282075 B6 20011008; SK 71298 A3 19981104

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031122

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031121

2004-07-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2003-12-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-11-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031122

2003-11-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-11-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031121

2002-11-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021127

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021120

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20021113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-05-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142102 T3

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606327 20000224

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188885 T 20000215

1999-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990201

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980525

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE