Global Patent Index - EP 0873349 A4

EP 0873349 A4 2001-03-14 - ENDOTHELIAL-MONOCYTE ACTIVATING POLYPEPTIDE III

Title (en)

ENDOTHELIAL-MONOCYTE ACTIVATING POLYPEPTIDE III

Title (de)

ENDOTHELMONOZYTEN AKTIVIERENDEN PLOYPEPTID.

Title (fr)

POLYPEPTIDE DE TYPE III ACTIVATEUR DES MONOCYTES ET DES CELLULES ENDOTHELIALES

Publication

EP 0873349 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95923777 A

Priority

US 9507328 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9640719A1] A human EMAP III polypeptide and DNA (RNA) encoding such polypeptide and a procedure for producing such polypeptide by recombinant techniques is disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such polypeptide for preventing and/or treating neoplasia. Diagnostic assays for identifying mutations in nucleic acid sequence encoding a polypeptide of the present invention and for detecting altered levels of the polypeptide of the present invention for detecting diseases, for example, cancer, are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C12P 21/00; C12P 21/08; C12N 1/21; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/19; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/70; C12N 15/74; C12N 15/79; A61K 38/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/19 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C07K 16/24 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/19 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01); C12N 15/70 (2006.01); C12N 15/74 (2006.01); C12N 15/79 (2006.01); C12P 21/00 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/52 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9509180 A1 19950406 - UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 23 April 1994 (1994-04-23), HILLIER, L. ET AL.: "The WashU-Merck EST Project", XP002152018
  • [X] DATABASE BIOSIS [online] BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; 1988, KORNELYUK A I ET AL: "TYROSYL TRANSFER RNA SYNTHETASE FROM BEEF LIVER PURIFICATION AND PHYSICO-CHEMICAL PROPERTIES", XP002152421, Database accession no. PREV198886058046 & MOLEKULYARNAYA BIOLOGIYA (MOSCOW), vol. 22, no. 1, 1988, pages 176 - 186, ISSN: 0026-8984MOLEKULYARNAYA BIOLOGIYA (MOSCOW)19882210026-8984176186
  • [X] DATABASE BIOSIS [online] BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; 1991, RIBKINSKA T A ET AL: "AN IMMUNOCHEMICAL APPROACH FOR STUDYING THE STRUCTURE OF TYROSYL-TRNA SYNTHETASE FROM BOVINE LIVER", XP002152422, Database accession no. PREV199294027274 & BIOPOLIMERY I KLETKA, vol. 7, no. 5, 1991, pages 33 - 36, ISSN: 0233-7657BIOPOLIMERY I KLETKA1991750233-76573336
  • [X] WOLFSON A D ET AL: "Purification of mammalian tyrosyl-tRNA synthetase by high-performance liquid chromatography.", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, vol. 503, no. 1, 9 March 1990 (1990-03-09), pages 277 - 281, XP000943307
  • [T] KLEEMAN, TA: "Human tyrosyl-tRNA synthetase shares amino acid sequecne homology with a putative cytokine", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 272, no. 22, 30 May 1997 (1997-05-30), pages 14420 - 14425, XP002152017 & DATABASE EMBL 8 December 1997 (1997-12-08), KLEEMAN, TA ET AL.: "Human tyrosyl-tRNA synthetase mRNA, complete cds."KLEEMAN, TA ET AL.Human tyrosyl-tRNA synthetase mRNA, complete cds.EMBL19971208
  • [T] DATABASE EMBL 2 December 1998 (1998-12-02), LEVANTES O.V. ET AL.: "Bos taurus tyrosyl t-RNA synthetase (TyrRS) mRNA, complete cds.", XP002152423
  • [T] WAKASUGI KEISUKE AND PAUL SCHIMMEL: "Two distinct cytokines released from a human aminoacyl-tRNA synthetase.", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), vol. 284, no. 5411, 2 April 1999 (1999-04-02), pages 147 - 151, XP002152420, ISSN: 0036-8075
  • See also references of WO 9640719A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9640719 A1 19961219; AU 2821695 A 19961230; CA 2221821 A1 19961219; EP 0873349 A1 19981028; EP 0873349 A4 20010314; JP 3759168 B2 20060322; JP H11507506 A 19990706

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060315

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030916

2001-03-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971217

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE