Global Patent Index - EP 0873384 B1

EP 0873384 B1 2001-12-12 - POWER TRANSMITTING FLUIDS WITH IMPROVED SHIFT DURABILITY

Title (en)

POWER TRANSMITTING FLUIDS WITH IMPROVED SHIFT DURABILITY

Title (de)

KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSFLÜSSIGKEITEN MIT EINER VERBESSERTEN SCHALTDAUERHAFTIGKEIT

Title (fr)

LIQUIDES POUR BOITE DE VITESSES PERMETTANT UN GAIN DE DURABILITE DU DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION

Publication

EP 0873384 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96934665 A

Priority

  • EP 9604452 W
  • GB 9521350 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9714771A1] The shift durability of power transmitting fluids, such as manual transmission fluids, are improved by additive combinations incorporating amine phosphates and neutral or acidic friction modifiers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 141/10; C10M 163/00; C10M 169/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 107/02 (2006.01); C10M 135/36 (2006.01); C10M 137/08 (2006.01); C10M 141/10 (2006.01); C10M 145/22 (2006.01); C10M 163/00 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 40/00 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01); C10N 40/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 163/00 (2013.01); C10M 129/10 (2013.01); C10M 129/70 (2013.01); C10M 129/72 (2013.01); C10M 129/74 (2013.01); C10M 129/76 (2013.01); C10M 133/12 (2013.01); C10M 135/36 (2013.01); C10M 137/10 (2013.01); C10M 141/10 (2013.01); C10M 159/123 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/024 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/284 (2013.01); C10M 2207/285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/287 (2013.01); C10M 2207/288 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2207/34 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/066 (2013.01); C10M 2215/067 (2013.01); C10M 2215/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/084 (2013.01); C10M 2219/10 (2013.01); C10M 2219/102 (2013.01); C10M 2219/104 (2013.01); C10M 2219/106 (2013.01); C10M 2219/108 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2223/047 (2013.01); C10M 2223/12 (2013.01); C10M 2223/121 (2013.01); C10M 2225/04 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/04 (2013.01); C10N 2240/042 (2013.01); C10N 2240/044 (2013.01); C10N 2240/046 (2013.01); C10N 2240/08 (2013.01); C10N 2270/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 2223/045 + C10M 2223/045

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9714771 A1 19970424; DE 69618013 D1 20020124; DE 69618013 T2 20020718; EP 0873384 A1 19981028; EP 0873384 B1 20011212; GB 9521350 D0 19951220; JP H11513720 A 19991124

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161010

2016-11-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161010

2016-10-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69618013

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69618013 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990729

1999-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEUM USA L.P.

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980508

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB