Global Patent Index - EP 0873393 B1

EP 0873393 B1 2000-03-29 - SOLID DETERGENT BLOCK

Title (en)

SOLID DETERGENT BLOCK

Title (de)

FESTER REINIGUNGSMITTELBLOCK

Title (fr)

BLOC DETERGENT SOLIDE

Publication

EP 0873393 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96937246 A

Priority

  • EP 96937246 A
  • EP 9604658 W
  • EP 95203080 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9718292A1] A solid detergent composition suitable for use in an industrial warewashing process and in the form of a block of compressed granular material is provided, said block having a weight of 0.2-10 kg and comprising: 25 - 35 % by weight of an alkalimetal hydroxide selected from sodium- and potassium hydroxide; 40 - 55 % by weight of a phosphate builder; 1 - 3 % by weight of a compressing aid selected from low foaming nonionic surfactants, metal soaps, paraffins, talcum powder, polyethylene glycol, sodium benzoate, mixtures of long chain ketones having more than 25 carbon atoms and fatty alcohols, and mixtures thereof; and up to 6% by weight of free water. Said block has optimal quality characteristics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/06; C11D 7/06; C11D 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/06 (2006.01); C11D 7/06 (2006.01); C11D 7/16 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/044 (2013.01); C11D 3/06 (2013.01); C11D 7/06 (2013.01); C11D 7/16 (2013.01); C11D 17/0047 (2013.01); C11D 17/0065 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9718292 A1 19970522; AU 700879 B2 19990114; AU 7493096 A 19970605; BR 9611281 A 19990126; CA 2236210 A1 19970522; DE 69607490 D1 20000504; DE 69607490 T2 20000824; EP 0873393 A1 19981028; EP 0873393 B1 20000329; ES 2146027 T3 20000716; JP 2000500178 A 20000111; TR 9600896 A2 19970521; TW 341599 B 19981001; ZA 9609316 B 19980506

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081024

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081024

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081023

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081023

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081023

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-03-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-02-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146027 T3

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607490 20000504

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990701

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980331

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT