Global Patent Index - EP 0873427 B8

EP 0873427 B8 2002-11-06 - PROCESS FOR DETECTING AND QUANTIFYING NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR DETECTING AND QUANTIFYING NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG UND QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON NUCLEINSÄURE-MOLEKÜLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DETECTION ET DE QUANTIFICATION DE MOLECULES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE

Publication

EP 0873427 B8 (DE)

Application

EP 97906982 A

Priority

  • DE 9700008 W
  • DE 19600362 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19600362A1] The invention relates to a process for detecting and quantifying nucleic acid (=NA) molecules within a population (I) of NA molecules of identical, similar or different sequence, in which: a) heteroduplexes are formed in which nucleotides which are unpaired or, according to Watson and Crick, incorrectly paired are chemically reactive with a carbon di-imide compound; b) the single or double-stranded ribonucleic acid (=RNA) molecules or single-stranded deoxyribonucleic acid (=DNA) molecules contained in population (I) are transferred into a population (II) of double-stranded DNA molecules; c) the population (II) of double-stranded DNA molecules are subjected to denaturation and subsequent renaturation, to produce a mixture of homo and heteroduplex DNA molecules. To make it possible to quantify the NA molecules detected, it is proposed that a purification stage take place between steps a) and b) and between steps b) and c).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6827 (2013.01); Y10T 436/143333 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C12Q 1/6827 + C12Q 2537/113 + C12Q 2527/107 + C12Q 2521/514
  2. C12Q 1/6827 + C12Q 2537/113 + C12Q 2533/101 + C12Q 2527/107

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19600362 A1 19970710; DE 19600362 C2 19981112; AT 222963 T 20020915; CA 2241185 A1 19970717; EP 0873427 A2 19981028; EP 0873427 B1 20020828; EP 0873427 B8 20021106; JP 2000502907 A 20000314; US 6306592 B1 20011023; WO 9725441 A2 19970717; WO 9725441 A3 19970925

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20111219

2012-09-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 222963 T

- Effective date: 20111219

2005-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050107

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050107

2004-01-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-01-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-12-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031230

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0873427E

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-10-30 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BERTLING WOLF

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708066 20021002

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IE LI

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222963 T 20020915

2002-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVEMBER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT GESELLSCHAFT FUER MOLE

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NOVEMBER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT GESELLSCHAFT FUER MOLE

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010906

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980701

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IE LI