Global Patent Index - EP 0873451 B1

EP 0873451 B1 2000-06-28 - PARTLY OVERHANGING BUILDING STRUCTURE UNDER THE NATURAL GROUND AND PROCESS FOR CLADDING AN OVERHANGING NATURAL GROUND WALL SECTION

Title (en)

PARTLY OVERHANGING BUILDING STRUCTURE UNDER THE NATURAL GROUND AND PROCESS FOR CLADDING AN OVERHANGING NATURAL GROUND WALL SECTION

Title (de)

TEILWEISE ÜBERHÄNGENDE BAUSTRUKTUR IN NATURUNTERGRUND UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSKLEIDUNG EINES ÜBERHÄNGENDEN NATURGRUND-WANDABSCHNITTES

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE CONSTRUCTION PARTIELLEMENT EN SURPLOMB DANS LE SOUS-SOL NATUREL ET PROCEDE DE REV TEMENT D'UNE SECTION DE PAROI EN SURPLOMB DANS LE SOUS-SOL NATUREL

Publication

EP 0873451 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96940978 A

Priority

  • EP 96940978 A
  • CH 9600446 W
  • EP 96100148 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0725185A1] In order to form an at least two-layer (5a, 9a) cladding as an entire item on an overhanging building structure, in which there is a plastic sealing layer (7a) between the layers, the layers (5a and 9a) are positively scraped over the sealing layer (7a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 1/00; E21D 11/10; E21D 11/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 1/00 (2006.01); E21D 11/10 (2006.01); E21D 11/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 11/105 (2013.01); E21D 11/383 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0725185 A1 19960807; AT 194183 T 20000715; AU 1028797 A 19970801; BR 9612416 A 19990713; CN 1161517 C 20040811; CN 1214095 A 19990414; DE 59605523 D1 20000803; DK 0873451 T3 20001016; EP 0873451 A1 19981028; EP 0873451 B1 20000628; ES 2148817 T3 20001016; JP 2000502767 A 20000307; JP 3889814 B2 20070307; NO 318999 B1 20050606; NO 983119 A 19980903; US 6193439 B1 20010227; WO 9725484 A1 19970717

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-07-18 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59605523

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2006-02-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-09-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-04-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: CONSTRUCTION RESEARCH & TECHNOLOGY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148817

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605523

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-03

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194183

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981217

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980618

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE