Global Patent Index - EP 0873494 A4

EP 0873494 A4 2000-12-27 - LEAD-FREE FRANGIBLE PROJECTILE

Title (en)

LEAD-FREE FRANGIBLE PROJECTILE

Title (de)

BLEIFREIES AUSEINANDERFALLENDES PROJEKTIL

Title (fr)

PROJECTILE DESINTEGRANT SANS PLOMB

Publication

EP 0873494 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96945203 A

Priority

  • US 9619940 W
  • US 1105396 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9727447A1] Frangible projectiles free of heavy metals suitable for use in indoor target ranges comprising tungsten and at least one metal selected from the group consisting of iron and copper. The projectiles are prepared from a mixture of tungsten and iron powders, tungsten and copper powders, or tungsten, iron and copper powders and compacted without sintering.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 8/14; F42B 10/32; F42B 12/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 8/16 (2006.01); F42B 12/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 8/16 (2013.01); F42B 12/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9727447A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9727447 A1 19970731; EP 0873494 A1 19981028; EP 0873494 A4 20001227; US 2002005137 A1 20020117

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021025

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RA BRANDS, L.L.C.

2000-12-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 42B 8/14 A, 7F 42B 10/32 B, 7F 42B 12/74 B

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980813

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB