Global Patent Index - EP 0873556 B1

EP 0873556 B1 2002-09-04 - BAGGAGE TAG

Title (en)

BAGGAGE TAG

Title (de)

GEPÄCKANHÄNGER

Title (fr)

ETIQUETTE POUR BAGAGES

Publication

EP 0873556 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97904126 A

Priority

  • US 9701545 W
  • US 59668796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9728523A1] The present invention provides a baggage tag (10) attachable to the handle (82) of a piece of baggage (80) for displaying indicia of the identification and destination of a passenger owning the baggage (80). The tag (10) has a first or base ply (20) and a second tear resistant ply or liner (30). The underside faces (24 and 34) of the base ply (20) and tear resistant liner (30) are arranged for engagement with one another. An adhesive (26) is disposed between the base ply (20) and the liner (30) for releasably sealing them together. It is preferred that a release coating (39) be applied to the underside face (34) of the liner (30). This allows the removal of the liner (30) from the adhesive layer, allowing the adhesive (26) to remain with the base ply (20). The base ply (20) and liner (30) each have cuts proximate one end thereof defining a claim stub (60). Upon removal of the claim stub (60), a length of the underside face (24) of the base ply (20) adjacent the base ply cut is exposed with the adhesive permitting the two tag ends to be secured around a bag handle (82).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2013.01); G09F 2003/0254 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9728523 A1 19970807; AU 1850097 A 19970822; AU 709668 B2 19990902; DE 69715150 D1 20021010; DE 69715150 T2 20030109; EP 0873556 A1 19981028; EP 0873556 B1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715150

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150108

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150114

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CORPORATE EXPRESS DOCUMENT & PRINT MANAGEMENT, IN

- Free text: CORPORATE EXPRESS DOCUMENT & PRINT MANAGEMENT, INC.#4205 S.96TH STREET#OMAHA, NE 68127-1290 (US) -TRANSFER TO- CORPORATE EXPRESS DOCUMENT & PRINT MANAGEMENT, INC.#4205 S.96TH STREET#OMAHA, NE 68127-1290 (US)

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715150 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORPORATE EXPRESS DOCUMENT & PRINT MANAGEMENT, INC

2000-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980819

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI