Global Patent Index - EP 0873593 A4

EP 0873593 A4 2000-03-01 - TIMING ADJUSTMENT CONTROL FOR EFFICIENT TIME DIVISION DUPLEX COMMUNICATION

Title (en)

TIMING ADJUSTMENT CONTROL FOR EFFICIENT TIME DIVISION DUPLEX COMMUNICATION

Title (de)

ZEITSTEUERUNGSREGELUNG FÜR ZEITDUPLEXÜBERTRAGUNG

Title (fr)

COMMANDE DE REGLAGE DE SYNCHRONISATION SERVANT A REALISER DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS EN DUPLEX A REPARTITION DANS LE TEMPS

Publication

EP 0873593 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96917850 A

Priority

  • US 9607905 W
  • US 46428595 A
  • US 46555595 A
  • US 46513795 A
  • US 46322095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9639749A1] A system for time division duplex communication over a single frequency band wherein guard time overhead is reduced by active adjustment of reverse link transmission timing as a function of round trip propagation delay. Responding to a polling message from the base station, a user station seeking to establish communication transmits a reply message. The base station using a propagation delay calculator (812) calculates the distance of the user station by measuring the propagation delay with respect to receipt of the reply message and a timing control unit (806) and transmitter (807) for sending a timing adjustment command to the user station instructing it to advance or retard its timing. Thereafter, the base station monitors the user station transmissions and periodically commands it to adjust its timing in a like manner. The user station transmits a control preamble at the start of each time slot to allow the base station to perform round trip timing calculations and adjustment of the user station's power or antenna selection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/00; H04B 7/26; H04J 1/00; H04J 3/06; H04J 3/12; H04J 3/16; H04J 3/24; H04M 3/42; H04M 9/00; H04M 11/00; H04Q 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/707 (2011.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04J 3/06 (2006.01); H04J 13/00 (2011.01); H04W 56/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 56/0055 (2013.01); H04B 1/7093 (2013.01); H04B 7/2681 (2013.01); H04J 3/0682 (2013.01); H04W 56/0045 (2013.01); H04J 2013/0037 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] US 5164958 A 19921117 - OMURA JIMMY K [US]
  • [X] US 5317571 A 19940531 - MARCEL FRANCOIS [FR], et al
  • [A] US 4460992 A 19840717 - GUTLEBER FRANK S [US]
  • [A] US 5313489 A 19940517 - MENICH BARRY J [US], et al
  • [PA] US 5509035 A 19960416 - TEIDEMANN JR EDWARD G [US], et al
  • [XA] ESMAILZADEH R ET AL: "QUASI-SYNCHRONOUS TIME DIVISION DUPLEX CDMA", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, pages 1637-1641, XP000488805, ISBN: 0-7803-1821-8
  • [XA] NEE VAN R D J: "TIMING ASPECTS OF SYNCHRONOUS CDMA", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS,XX,XX, pages 439-443, XP000619815
  • [A] NAOYA MORI ET AL: "FRAME TIMING ACQUISITION FOR DIRECT SEQUENCE SPREAD SPECTRUM SIGNALS IN TIME DIVISION DUPLEX TRANSMISSION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. CONF. 43, pages 815-818, XP000393306, ISBN: 0-7803-1267-8
  • See also references of WO 9639749A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9639749 A1 19961212; AR 002311 A1 19980311; AU 6025796 A 19961224; BR 9608548 A 19990706; CA 2223321 A1 19961212; CN 1101088 C 20030205; CN 1192300 A 19980902; EP 0873593 A1 19981028; EP 0873593 A4 20000301; IL 118447 A 20000131; IL 118447 D0 19960912; JP 2001524268 A 20011127; JP 3455227 B2 20031014; KR 19990022469 A 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060523

2006-01-06 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1013604

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040213

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XIRCOM WIRELESS, INC.

2000-03-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04B 1/00 A, 7H 04J 1/00 B, 7H 04J 3/06 B, 7H 04J 3/12 B, 7H 04J 3/16 B, 7H 04J 3/24 B, 7H 04M 3/42 B, 7H 04M 9/00 B, 7H 04M 11/00 B, 7H 04Q 9/00 B, 7H 04B 7/26 B

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980105

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE