Global patent index - EP 0873666 B1

EP 0873666 B1 2000-05-10 - IMPROVEMENT TO AN ELECTROACOUSTIC COMMUNICATION DEVICE FOR USE ON PROTECTIVE HEADGEAR

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENT TO AN ELECTROACOUSTIC COMMUNICATION DEVICE FOR USE ON PROTECTIVE HEADGEAR

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNG FÜR ELEKTROAKUSTISCHES ÜBERTRAGUNGSGERÄT ZUM EINBAU IN EINEN HELM UND SCHUTZHELM

Title (fr)

PERFECTIONNEMENT POUR DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION DU TYPE ELECTROACOUSTIQUE DESTINE A EQUIPER UN CASQUE DE PROTECTION

Publication

EP 0873666 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97900622 A

Priority

  • FR 9700041 W
  • FR 9600459 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9725832A1] An electroacoustic communication device (1) including a sensor, e.g. a microphone, and an earphone, and suitable for use on protective headgear (30). The sensor and the earphone are arranged in a housing (4) and connecting means are provided for attaching the housing (4) to the headgear (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/30 (2006.01); H04R 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/1058 (2013.01); A42B 3/30 (2013.01); H04R 1/10 (2013.01); H04R 1/1008 (2013.01); H04R 1/1066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9725832 A1 19970717; AT 192894 T 20000515; AU 1313197 A 19970801; BR 9707137 A 19990518; DE 69701959 D1 20000615; DE 69701959 T2 20001228; DK 0873666 T3 20001009; EP 0873666 A1 19981028; EP 0873666 B1 20000510; ES 2147666 T3 20000916; FR 2743682 A1 19970718; FR 2743682 B1 19980313; US 6608908 B1 20030819

INPADOC legal status

2010-01-06 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27C

- Effective date: 20090829

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070110

2008-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070110

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *GALLET

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070109

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070109

2007-10-15 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2007-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070109

2007-09-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-01-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070110

2006-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060110

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060109

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050110

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CEOTRONICS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT AUDIO-VIDEO-DATA COM

2001-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CEOTRONICS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT AUDIO-VIDEO-DATA COM

- Effective date: 20010113

2000-10-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147666

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701959

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI GB NL SE

2000-05-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192894

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990111

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980703

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI GB NL SE