Global Patent Index - EP 0873703 A3

EP 0873703 A3 2001-05-16 - Shelf system

Title (en)

Shelf system

Title (de)

Regalsystem

Title (fr)

Système d'étagères

Publication

EP 0873703 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105053 A

Priority

DE 29705604 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0873703A2] Shelves are fitted into regularly spaced apart holes in vertical support columns (1). A solid gap of thirty-three and one third mm is left between each adjacent hole in the column. The distance between every first and fourth hole is ten mm. Both distances are within tolerances of two mm. In a similar unit the column contains two holes in its base region for receiving journals extending at right-angles from the middle of the top side of the shelving unit feet (2), while further holes are used to hang shelves (6) by journals extending at right-angles from the middle of their bottom side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 57/42; A47B 57/30; A47B 91/00; A47B 96/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29705604 U1 19980730; EP 0873703 A2 19981028; EP 0873703 A3 20010516; NO 981319 A 19980928; NO 981319 D0 19980324; PL 187739 B1 20040930; PL 325497 A1 19980928; TR 9800566 A2 19981021

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011001

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47B 57/42 A, 7A 47B 57/30 B, 7A 47B 96/14 B, 7A 47B 91/00 B

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI