Global Patent Index - EP 0873709 A3

EP 0873709 A3 2000-02-02 - Mattress support

Title (en)

Mattress support

Title (de)

Matratzenstütze

Title (fr)

Support de matelas

Publication

EP 0873709 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98201150 A

Priority

NL 1005900 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0873709A2] Mattress support consisting of a slatted base (7), on which a resilient layer (8) is fitted, which resilient layer is composed of a foam layer with an open-cell structure into which an endless wire spring (9) is foamed. A layer (12) of wadding felt is fitted on the foam layer. A cover (18) is fitted around the resilient layer and the compressible layer, which cover is fixed to the underside of the slatted base by means of fastening means (19), for example staples. A synthetic fleece (17) is fitted between the air-permeable, resilient layer. The slatted base and the foam layer lying on the slatted base lie recessed in a frame. The foam layer is provided with an edge part (13) at the side edges, which edge part comprises at the top side a first recess, in which the side edges of the layer of wadding felt lie recessed, and a second recess, in which the side edges of the frame are accommodated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/20; A47C 23/06; A47C 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/06 (2006.01); A47C 27/04 (2006.01); A47C 27/05 (2006.01); A47C 27/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/05 (2013.01); A47C 23/06 (2013.01); A47C 27/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0873709 A2 19981028; EP 0873709 A3 20000202; NL 1005900 C2 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020506

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 27/20 A, 7A 47C 23/06 B, 7A 47C 27/04 B

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI