Global Patent Index - EP 0873767 A3

EP 0873767 A3 2000-04-12 - Method and device for operating a fire suppression dry Sprinkler system

Title (en)

Method and device for operating a fire suppression dry Sprinkler system

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Betreiben einer Feuerlöschtrockensprinkler-Anlage

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour faire fonctionner un système de têtes d'extinction d'incendie secs

Publication

EP 0873767 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98105456 A

Priority

DE 19716585 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0873767A2] The pipeline system from the dry alarm valve (3) to the sprinklers (9) is filled with compressed air. The alarm valve is held closed by pressure compensation on the air and extinguishing water side and opened when the pressure drops on the air side. The pipeline system is rapidly ventilated by an electric magnetic valve (61) controlled by a fire warning central unit (58) and the dry alarm valve is rapidly opened by a pneumatic device and an additional device controlled by the fire warning central unit. The rapid openings for the dry alarm valve are carried out by a throttle stretch and the rapid opening for ventilating the pipeline system is carried out by a magnetic valve or diaphragm valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 35/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 35/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 3/004 (2013.01); A62C 35/68 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716585 A1 19981022; AT 286766 T 20050115; CZ 9801062 A3 19981014; EP 0873767 A2 19981028; EP 0873767 A3 20000412; EP 0873767 B1 20050112; HU 9800608 A2 19981228; HU 9800608 A3 19990830; HU 9800608 D0 19980528; PL 186007 B1 20030930; PL 325894 A1 19981026

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160326

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2006-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050423

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812476 P 20050217

2005-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI LU NL

2005-01-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050112

2005-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040112

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI LU NL

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000520

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR IT LI LU NL

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI