Global Patent Index - EP 0873801 A3

EP 0873801 A3 2001-05-02 - Process and device for separating and transporting uncooled, out-of-tolerance wire windings

Title (en)

Process and device for separating and transporting uncooled, out-of-tolerance wire windings

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abtrennen und Abtransportieren ungekühlter und nicht toleranzhaltiger Drahtwindungen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de sectionnement et transport de spires de fil non-refroidi et non-conformant aux tolerances

Publication

EP 0873801 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106999 A

Priority

DE 19717770 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0873801A2] The method concerns separation and removal of uncooled wire coils which are outside a tolerance band, in an installation with a coil transport conveyor (1). The method includes the following steps: a) a number of leading coils is counted and (according to a predetermined number) separated from the rest; b) the separated coils (30') are accelerated over a limited transport section (2), while the coils (30) are decelerated so that the cutting zone (3) is broadened during transport; c) at the end of the section (2) the coils (30') pass through open points (4) and are directed downwards for collection and further processing; d) the points (4) are closed for the coils (30) to proceed onto the conveyor (1). The apparatus includes a unit (14) for monitoring the number of wire coils (30; 30') and the position of the movable cutting zone (3). This unit has a means for operating both the shears (13) and the points (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/14 (2006.01); B21B 1/16 (2006.01); B21B 15/00 (2006.01); B21B 39/00 (2006.01); B21B 41/00 (2006.01); B21C 47/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/262 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0873801 A2 19981028; EP 0873801 A3 20010502; EP 0873801 B1 20040602; AT 268230 T 20040615; DE 19717770 A1 19981029; JP H1177137 A 19990323; US 5988551 A 19991123

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150417

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150418

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150417

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2015-12-15 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 268230 T

- Effective date: 20150417

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59811494

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59811494

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59811494

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140429

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811494 P 20040708

2004-07-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030424

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE IT SE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980417

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT SE

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI