Global patent index - EP 0873833 A3

EP 0873833 A3 2000-05-10 - Gear linkage for a mortar mixing pump

Title (en)

Gear linkage for a mortar mixing pump

Title (de)

Verbindungsgestänge für eine Mörtelmischpumpe

Title (fr)

Tringlerie pour un mélangeur de mortier

Publication

EP 0873833 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107242 A

Priority

DE 29707281 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0873833A2] Mortar is mixed using a pump with a connecting rod comprising a coupling piece (16) for connection of a motor, attached at the other end to a cross piece (19) of a mixing cage frame (15). Vertical frame bars (20) extend to a lower coupling piece (17) to the pump. A spiral (14) is formed by bent frame bar and is fastened at one end (21) to a frame bar (20) and fixed (20) to the other frame bar, extending at least to the latter bar and having its other end (23) left free at the height of the frame bars. Preferably the frame bars extend over a distance above the fixing point and the cross piece is in the upper third of the spiral.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 7/16 (2006.01); B01F 7/24 (2006.01); B01F 13/00 (2006.01); B01F 13/10 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01); B28C 5/12 (2006.01); B01F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00408 (2013.01); B01F 7/16 (2013.01); B01F 7/245 (2013.01); B01F 13/0035 (2013.01); B01F 13/004 (2013.01); B01F 13/1027 (2013.01); B01F 15/0249 (2013.01); B28C 5/1276 (2013.01); B01F 7/00441 (2013.01); B01F 15/0201 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29707281 U1 19970612; EP 0873833 A2 19981028; EP 0873833 A3 20000510

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030322

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020801

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 28C 5/16 A

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI