Global Patent Index - EP 0873957 B1

EP 0873957 B1 2001-12-12 - Device for cutting a paper web and attaching an adhesive tape to the edge of the web

Title (en)

Device for cutting a paper web and attaching an adhesive tape to the edge of the web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Schneiden einer Papierbahn und zum Anbringen eines Klebebandes an der Schnittkante der Papierbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour couper une bande de papier et attacher une bande adhésive au bord de la bande

Publication

EP 0873957 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98106306 A

Priority

DE 19717078 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0873957A1] A frame has a horizontal guide-rail (6) and a holder for a roll of paper. The cutter and applicator (7) runs along the guide-rail in an operating direction (8). The cutter (24,27) produces a straight cut edge at the end of the web of paper (4). A holder (12) for the adhesive strip, on a guide-carriage (9) moving along the guide-rail has a reel (29) for unwinding the roll (30) of adhesive strip. A pressure-appliance (41), co-operating with a pressure rail (21) is positioned after the cutter in the operating direction, and presses the adhesive strip (36) protruding beyond the cut edge onto the end of the web of paper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/102 (2013.01); B65H 2301/46064 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4607 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1348 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1378 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1793 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1795 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0873957 A1 19981028; EP 0873957 B1 20011212; DE 19717078 A1 19981029; ES 2169454 T3 20020701; US 6079470 A 20000627

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080407

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080408

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080407

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080408

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080407

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169454 T3

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802392 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010213

1999-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990311

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI