Global Patent Index - EP 0874096 B1

EP 0874096 B1 2001-02-21 - Machine and process for crimping a sleeve on a rebar

Title (en)

Machine and process for crimping a sleeve on a rebar

Title (de)

Maschine und Verfahren zum Quetschen von einer Müffe an einem Betonstahl

Title (fr)

Machine et procédé pour le sertissage d'un coupleur sur un rond à béton

Publication

EP 0874096 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97490012 A

Priority

EP 97490012 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0874096A1] The machine fastens a threaded coupling to the end of a steel reinforcing rod used in concrete and comprises a screw mechanism (2) to grip the threaded end of the coupling. It also has a clamp mechanism with jaws (21) which apply a pressure to the sides of the coupling and fix it in place by crimping. A coupling is fitted manually to the end of the reinforcing rod which is then pushed inside the machine until it meets the screw mechanism. A further pressure on the rod actuates the machine and starts an automatic cycle which crimps the coupling onto the rod and tests the joint for fastness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/16; B21D 39/04; E04G 21/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2006.01); E04C 5/16 (2006.01); E04G 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2013.01); E04C 5/165 (2013.01); E04G 21/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0874096 A1 19981028; EP 0874096 B1 20010221; DE 69704108 D1 20010329; DE 69704108 T2 20010920; RU 2159312 C2 20001120; TW 405008 B 20000911

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170424

2017-05-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170424

2017-04-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69704108

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160408

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010522

2001-05-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-05-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-05-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREV.

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704108 20010329

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010221

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEXTRA HOLDING

1999-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990204

1998-10-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971024

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE