Global patent index - EP 0874100 A3

EP 0874100 A3 2001-02-21 - Diffusion sheet, in particular in the form of a braced undersheet for roofs

Title (en)

Diffusion sheet, in particular in the form of a braced undersheet for roofs

Title (de)

Diffusionsfolie, insbesondere in Form einer Unterspannbahn für Dächer

Title (fr)

Feuile de diffusion, notamment sous la forme d'une feuille armée de sous-couche pour toits

Publication

EP 0874100 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107076 A

Priority

DE 19716582 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0874100A2] The diffusion sheet (1) forms a roof (D) under-lining. On one face (2) there is plastic reinforcement in the form of a spacer grid (G). This minimises contact area with the diffusion sheet. The spacing (A) is maintained by crossing sections (13) interconnected by bridging sections (14, 15). Longitudinal compressibility of the bridges (14, 15) is a novel and significant feature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 12/00; B32B 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 12/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716582 A1 19981022; EP 0874100 A2 19981028; EP 0874100 A3 20010221

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011101

2002-01-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI