Global Patent Index - EP 0874104 A3

EP 0874104 A3 2001-02-28 - Awning

Title (en)

Awning

Title (de)

Markise

Title (fr)

Store

Publication

EP 0874104 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98106396 A

Priority

DE 19716829 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0874104A2] The awning cloth (11) winds onto a shaft in the housing via an opening, the housing being supported by individual brackets (13). The housing is in two or more sections (16, 17) fixed to the brackets, and which at the bottom form slots running for its full length. Bottom edges (18, 19) of the housing sections can be spaced apart in the transverse direction. These edges can form the slots, and can have portions (29) bent so as to engage in pockets (28) in the brackets, these being secured by a locking stopper fitting over them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/02 (2006.01); E04F 10/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/0685 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] DE 19524420 A1 19970116 - MHZ SONNENSCHUTZTECH GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0874104 A2 19981028; EP 0874104 A3 20010228; EP 0874104 B1 20041020; AT 280289 T 20041115; CZ 293995 B6 20040915; CZ 9801213 A3 19990113; DE 19716829 A1 19981029; DE 19716829 C2 20030925; ES 2226023 T3 20050316; HU 222302 B1 20030628; HU 9800928 A1 20000528; HU 9800928 D0 19980629; PL 197187 B1 20080331; PL 325934 A1 19981026

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160408

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160501

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 280289 T

- Effective date: 20160408

2016-12-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160501

2016-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812142

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070408

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226023 T3

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812142 P 20041125

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030826

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-10-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI LU NL

1998-10-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI